NY S02776 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - VETOED MEMO.71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - VETOED MEMO.71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Fredonia central school district to receive state aid for certain approved capital funded projects.
Title
Authorizes the Fredonia central school district to receive state aid for certain approved capital funded projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.71 |
2011-09-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.568 |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | substituted for a6217 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.851 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06217 (Same As) 2011-06-22 - substituted by s2776