NY S02758 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds new conditions on authorized lenders of reverse mortgages including: delivery of a plain language notice, providing the borrower with a reverse mortgage worksheet guide and counseling, and a lapse of seven days between the reverse mortgage counseling and acceptance of the borrower's final application.
Title
Adds new conditions on authorized lenders of reverse mortgages including: delivery of a plain language notice, providing the borrower with a reverse mortgage worksheet guide and counseling, and a lapse of seven days between the reverse mortgage counseling and acceptance of the borrower's final application.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.639 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.245 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2758A |
2017-02-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGING |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A07589 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to judiciary