NY S02722 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a controlled substance analogue shall be deemed to be the controlled substance to which it is substantially similar or mimics.
Title
Provides that a controlled substance analogue shall be deemed to be the controlled substance to which it is substantially similar or mimics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1486 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-04-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-04-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.387 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02970 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to health