NY S02720 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the state board of parole to require a violent felony offender to serve his or her maximum term, if, by clear and convincing evidence, release would pose an imminent threat to society; authorizes the withholding of good behavior allowances of violent felony offenders by the state board of parole upon such a finding.
Title
Authorizes the state board of parole to require a violent felony offender to serve his or her maximum term, if, by clear and convincing evidence, release would pose an imminent threat to society; authorizes the withholding of good behavior allowances of violent felony offenders by the state board of parole upon such a finding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2016-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.427 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2015-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.980 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02411 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to correction