NY S02711 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the establishment of reduced residential rates for electric and natural gas service to low-income customers.
Title
Relates to the establishment of reduced residential rates for electric and natural gas service to low-income customers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-02-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2711A |
2024-02-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.236 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05323 (Same As) 2024-02-02 - print number 5323a