NY A05323 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-02 - print number 5323a
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the establishment of reduced residential rates for electric and natural gas service to low-income customers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the establishment of reduced residential rates for electric and natural gas service to low-income customers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-02Assemblyprint number 5323a
2024-02-02Assemblyamend and recommit to energy
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to energy
2023-03-07Assemblyreferred to energy

Same As/Similar To

S02711 (Same As) 2024-02-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback