NY S02694 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1628
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1628
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the authority of the commissioner of general services to lease public buildings; authorizes the commissioner of general services to promulgate any necessary rules and regulations.
Title
Relates to the authority of the commissioner of general services to lease public buildings; authorizes the commissioner of general services to promulgate any necessary rules and regulations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1628 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.766 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01628 (Same As) 2023-12-22 - tabled