NY S02664 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires car wash workers to be paid the minimum wage without allowance for gratuities.
Title
Requires car wash workers to be paid the minimum wage without allowance for gratuities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2017-05-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2664A |
2017-05-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A02967 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
A10612 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - ordered to third reading rules cal.63
A10612 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - ordered to third reading rules cal.63