NY S02645 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants sales and use tax exemptions for certain tangible personal property and services used in the operation of recreational skiing facilities.
Title
Grants sales and use tax exemptions for certain tangible personal property and services used in the operation of recreational skiing facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1229 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1046 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2645A |
2017-04-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-04-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06622 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means