NY S02621 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the commissioner of health to award grants for graduate medical education in Lyme and tick-borne disease and to designate organizations as centers for Lyme and tick-borne disease excellence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the commissioner of health to award grants for graduate medical education in Lyme and tick-borne disease and to designate organizations as centers for Lyme and tick-borne disease excellence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04Assemblyreferred to higher education
2018-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-15SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2621A
2018-05-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1147
2018-05-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-05-15Assemblyreferred to higher education
2017-05-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-05-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-05-09SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.806
2017-05-09SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-01-13SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A05501 (Same As) 2018-06-01 - print number 5501a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback