NY A05501 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - print number 5501a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the commissioner of health to award grants for graduate medical education in Lyme and tick-borne disease and to designate organizations as centers for Lyme and tick-borne disease excellence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the commissioner of health to award grants for graduate medical education in Lyme and tick-borne disease and to designate organizations as centers for Lyme and tick-borne disease excellence.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01Assemblyprint number 5501a
2018-06-01Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to higher education
2017-02-09Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S02621 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - referred to higher education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback