NY S02617 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the expenditure of state, local and public authority moneys relating to any civilian criminal trial of enemy combatants for acts of terrorism in any federal court in the state of New York.
Title
Prohibits the expenditure of state, local and public authority moneys relating to any civilian criminal trial of enemy combatants for acts of terrorism in any federal court in the state of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1228 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.616 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |