NY S02555 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any qualified homeowner in the city of New York shall be eligible to be exempted from any future increases in water rate fees.
Title
Provides that any qualified homeowner in the city of New York shall be eligible to be exempted from any future increases in water rate fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2019-08-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2555A |
2019-08-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-02-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00247 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to cities