NY S02528 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to health care professional applications and terminations.
Title
Relates to health care professional applications and terminations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-02-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.517 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.579 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A04177 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.142