NY S02520 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the employee benefit accrued liability reserve fund.
Title
Relates to the employee benefit accrued liability reserve fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-10-23 | PRINT NUMBER 2520A | |
2009-10-23 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-02-23 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10144 (Same As) 2010-03-05 - referred to local governments