NY S02514 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides information on where to seek help regarding sexual trauma in the military.
Title
Provides information on where to seek help regarding sexual trauma in the military.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2015-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A01945 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE