NY A01945 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides information on where to seek help regarding sexual trauma in the military.
Title
Provides information on where to seek help regarding sexual trauma in the military.
Sponsors
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Addie Jenne [D] | Asm. Didi Barrett [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.433 |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | committed to veterans' affairs |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.89 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.232 |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-13 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S02514 (Same As) 2016-05-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE