NY S02505 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the state mortgage agency to purchase veterans' assisted forward commitment mortgages from banks within the state; requires the board of directors of the state mortgage agency to establish income limits for eligible veterans from time to time.
Title
Authorizes the state mortgage agency to purchase veterans' assisted forward commitment mortgages from banks within the state; requires the board of directors of the state mortgage agency to establish income limits for eligible veterans from time to time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2011-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.983 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A01253 (Same As) 2012-05-22 - held for consideration in judiciary