NY S02486 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-7)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - SIGNED CHAP.13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-7)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - SIGNED CHAP.13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Delays the requirement that prescribers use electronic prescriptions.
Title
Delays the requirement that prescribers use electronic prescriptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.13 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.36 |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | substituted for a4274 |
2015-02-10 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-02-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-02-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-02-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING FROM SPECIAL REPORT CAL.57 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | SPECIAL REPORT CAL.57 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A04274 (Same As) 2015-02-25 - substituted by s2486