NY S02469 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes lakes in adopt-a-municipal park, shoreline or roadway programs.
Title
Includes lakes in adopt-a-municipal park, shoreline or roadway programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2469A |
2017-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.232 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01722 (Same As) 2017-06-13 - enacting clause stricken
A08599 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - reported referred to rules
A08599 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - reported referred to rules