NY S02458 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "taxi driver protection act"; requires a sign in every for-hire vehicle that states "ATTENTION: Assaulting A Driver Is Punishable By Up To Twenty-Five Years In Prison".
Title
Enacts the "taxi driver protection act"; requires a sign in every for-hire vehicle that states "ATTENTION: Assaulting A Driver Is Punishable By Up To Twenty-Five Years In Prison".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.493 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2458B |
2017-03-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2017-02-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2458A |
2017-02-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |