NY S02455 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing that green bank funds include fund programs assisting certain building owners with installing energy efficient upgrades.
Title
Relates to providing that green bank funds include fund programs assisting certain building owners with installing energy efficient upgrades.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | AMENDED 2455A |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.94 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1779 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |