NY S02445 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.257
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.257
Summary
Extends provisions authorizing the county of Cortland to impose an additional mortgage recording tax until November 30, 2011.
Title
Extends provisions authorizing the county of Cortland to impose an additional mortgage recording tax until November 30, 2011.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-28 | SIGNED CHAP.257 | |
2009-07-17 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-06-22 | returned to senate | |
2009-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-22 | home rule request | |
2009-06-22 | ordered to third reading rules cal.536 | |
2009-06-22 | substituted for a6832 | |
2009-06-04 | referred to ways and means | |
2009-06-04 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-06-04 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-06-04 | HOME RULE REQUEST | |
2009-05-26 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-20 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-19 | 1ST REPORT CAL.403 | |
2009-02-20 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02445&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |