NY S02419 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases penalties for individuals or companies who engage in the business of cashing checks, drafts or money orders for consideration without a license; makes such violation a class E felony; provides for a fine of $2,500 for each transaction.
Title
Increases penalties for individuals or companies who engage in the business of cashing checks, drafts or money orders for consideration without a license; makes such violation a class E felony; provides for a fine of $2,500 for each transaction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2018-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.648 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2017-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1347 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A01940 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to banks