NY S02411 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Preserves the ability to appeal a violation of a defendant's right to make a statement personally in his or her own behalf at sentencing notwithstanding a defendant signed an otherwise valid waiver of appeal.
Title
Preserves the ability to appeal a violation of a defendant's right to make a statement personally in his or her own behalf at sentencing notwithstanding a defendant signed an otherwise valid waiver of appeal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1006 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2023-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A10363 (Same As) 2024-05-21 - referred to codes