NY S02356 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-28 - signed chap.186
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-28 - signed chap.186
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires companies to allow victims of domestic violence to cancel contracts when there is a domestic violence incident report, a police report, an order of protection or a signed affidavit.
Title
Requires companies to allow victims of domestic violence to cancel contracts when there is a domestic violence incident report, a police report, an order of protection or a signed affidavit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-28 | Senate | signed chap.186 |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.119 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2356 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-05-14 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-14 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.144 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-06 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-08 | Senate | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-05-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5318 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.119 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05318 (Same As) 2019-08-28 - signed chap.186