NY S02356 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires reporting by the office of children and family services regarding the supply and demand for child care services for each local social services district and the child care assistance provided under the block grant for child care.
Title
Requires reporting by the office of children and family services regarding the supply and demand for child care services for each local social services district and the child care assistance provided under the block grant for child care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-02-21 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2011-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A03554 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to children and families