NY S02352 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Hearing: May 6 in Room 124 CAP
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Hearing: May 6 in Room 124 CAP
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires real estate brokers and salespersons to compile and disclose client demographic data to the secretary of state; requires real estate brokers and salespersons to request the voluntary disclosure of demographic information from clients and record and retain such information for a period of two years.
Title
Requires real estate brokers and salespersons to compile and disclose client demographic data to the secretary of state; requires real estate brokers and salespersons to request the voluntary disclosure of demographic information from clients and record and retain such information for a period of two years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-02-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.222 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |