NY S02333 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - PRINT NUMBER 2333A
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - PRINT NUMBER 2333A
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the filing of additional transferor and contributor identification information in campaign receipt and expenditure statements, including the occupation, employer and employer's address in the case of a natural person.
Title
Requires the filing of additional transferor and contributor identification information in campaign receipt and expenditure statements, including the occupation, employer and employer's address in the case of a natural person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2333A |
2020-02-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2019-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.161 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |