NY S02303 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-04 - PRINT NUMBER 2303C
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-04 - PRINT NUMBER 2303C
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes political subdivisions and commuter railroads to establish owner liability for failure of an operator of a motor vehicle to obey a signal indicating the approach of a train utilizing photo monitoring devices.
Title
Authorizes political subdivisions and commuter railroads to establish owner liability for failure of an operator of a motor vehicle to obey a signal indicating the approach of a train utilizing photo monitoring devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2303C |
2018-01-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2303B |
2017-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 2303A |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.219 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04795 (Same As) 2018-02-28 - print number 4795c