NY S02294 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-28 - PRINT NUMBER 2294A
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-28 - PRINT NUMBER 2294A
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates community college high-technology investment program (C-CHIP) to award grants of up to $100,000 to community colleges to upgrade their educational, occupational, and training services including their facilities, labs, and high technology equipment.
Title
Creates community college high-technology investment program (C-CHIP) to award grants of up to $100,000 to community colleges to upgrade their educational, occupational, and training services including their facilities, labs, and high technology equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | PRINT NUMBER 2294A | |
2010-05-28 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | |
2009-02-17 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A354 (Same As) 2010-06-08 - print number 354a