NY S02254 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "severely and permanently disabled" for purposes of state scholarships and education loans.
Title
Defines "severely and permanently disabled" for purposes of state scholarships and education loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2016-05-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.685 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2015-05-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.237 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |