NY S02243 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "engineers', architects', landscape architects' and land surveyors' good samaritan act" to protect from liability for personal injury, wrongful death, property damage or other loss, professional engineers, architects, landscape architects and land surveyors who render voluntary services, without compensation acting reasonably and in good faith, at the scene of a natural disaster or catastrophe.
Title
Enacts the "engineers', architects', landscape architects' and land surveyors' good samaritan act" to protect from liability for personal injury, wrongful death, property damage or other loss, professional engineers, architects, landscape architects and land surveyors who render voluntary services, without compensation acting reasonably and in good faith, at the scene of a natural disaster or catastrophe.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1335 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.747 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A05163 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to higher education