NY S02193 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the urban and regional farmers' markets facilities construction program; defines related terms and regulates grants and financing; establishes revolving loan and loan guarantee fund.
Title
Establishes the urban and regional farmers' markets facilities construction program; defines related terms and regulates grants and financing; establishes revolving loan and loan guarantee fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2013-11-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2193A |
2013-11-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2013-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05321 (Same As) 2013-06-11 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
A08677 (Same As) 2014-06-09 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
A08677 (Same As) 2014-06-09 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS