NY S02172 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 2172B
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 2172B
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a judicial diversion program for certain felony offenders; expands definition for an eligible defendant.
Title
Relates to a judicial diversion program for certain felony offenders; expands definition for an eligible defendant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2172B |
2020-01-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2172A |
2019-02-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A01510 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - amended on third reading 1510b