NY A01510 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - amended on third reading 1510b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - amended on third reading 1510b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a judicial diversion program for certain felony offenders; expands definition for an eligible defendant.
Title
Relates to a judicial diversion program for certain felony offenders; expands definition for an eligible defendant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1510b |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.76 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.179 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | print number 1510a |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02172 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 2172B