NY S02164 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to a half fare rate program in the MTA for veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to a half fare rate program in the MTA for veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1820
2018-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-01SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-14Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2017-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-05SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1415
2017-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-01-12SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A01770 (Same As) 2018-05-11 - print number 1770a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback