NY A01770 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-11 - print number 1770a
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-11 - print number 1770a
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a half fare rate program in the MTA for veterans.
Title
Relates to a half fare rate program in the MTA for veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Assembly | print number 1770a |
2018-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-01-13 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S02164 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES