NY S02157 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 2157B
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 2157B
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disclosure of the identities of political committees making certain expenditures for political communications.
Title
Relates to disclosure of the identities of political committees making certain expenditures for political communications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2157B |
2016-01-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2015-04-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2157A |
2015-04-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2015-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04286 (Same As) 2016-03-16 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS