NY A04286 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disclosure of the identities of political committees making certain expenditures for political communications.
Title
Relates to disclosure of the identities of political committees making certain expenditures for political communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4286b |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.175 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4286a |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.194 |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-30 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S02157 (Same As) 2016-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 2157B