NY S02142 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the remediation and prevention of indoor mold; requires the disclosure of indoor mold history upon the sale of certain real property; requires notification to prospective lessees; directs the commissioner of housing and community renewal and the commissioner of health to promulgate rules and standards for the remediation and prevention of indoor mold.
Title
Relates to the remediation and prevention of indoor mold; requires the disclosure of indoor mold history upon the sale of certain real property; requires notification to prospective lessees; directs the commissioner of housing and community renewal and the commissioner of health to promulgate rules and standards for the remediation and prevention of indoor mold.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.520 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2001 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2142A |
2017-06-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04964 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to housing