NY S02123 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to penalties for the crimes relating to methamphetamine laboratory operations, including criminal possession of methamphetamine manufacturing materials and unlawful manufacture of methamphetamines.
Title
Relates to penalties for the crimes relating to methamphetamine laboratory operations, including criminal possession of methamphetamine manufacturing materials and unlawful manufacture of methamphetamines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1272 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |