NY S02113 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that physician registration and hospital admission registration forms in a city with a population of one million or more include the name of school attended by school-aged patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that physician registration and hospital admission registration forms in a city with a population of one million or more include the name of school attended by school-aged patients.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-07SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2113A
2018-06-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-06-04Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-31Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1483
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2017-01-12SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A00352 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - amended on third reading (t) 352a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback