NY S02098 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-19 - SIGNED CHAP.333
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-19 - SIGNED CHAP.333
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "elephant protection act" to prohibit the use of elephants in entertainment acts.
Title
Enacts the "elephant protection act" to prohibit the use of elephants in entertainment acts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-19 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.333 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.483 |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | substituted for a464b |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2098B |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-15 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 2098A |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.775 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A00464 (Same As) 2017-06-05 - substituted by s2098b