NY S02093 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Lorraine's Law"; increases from twenty-four to sixty months, the time for which reconsideration for parole for a violent felony offense shall be determined.
Title
Enacts "Lorraine's Law"; increases from twenty-four to sixty months, the time for which reconsideration for parole for a violent felony offense shall be determined.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Palumbo [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Mario Mattera [R] | Sen. Peter Oberacker [R] |
Sen. James Tedisco [R] | Sen. Alexis Weik [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2023-04-26 | Senate | DEFEATED IN CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2023-03-08 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2023-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |