NY S02089 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A357A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A357A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the issuance of a New York State Vietnam War Commemorative Medal.
Title
Relates to the issuance of a New York State Vietnam War Commemorative Medal.
Sponsors
Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. John Brooks [D] |
Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Alexis Weik [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A357A |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1524 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-05-04 | Senate | AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 2089B |
2022-05-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2089C |
2022-05-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2022-02-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2089B |
2022-02-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2021-05-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2089A |
2021-05-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-05-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A00357 (Same As) 2022-11-10 - signed chap.582