NY A00357 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-10 - signed chap.582
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-10 - signed chap.582
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the issuance of a New York State Vietnam War Commemorative Medal.
Title
Relates to the issuance of a New York State Vietnam War Commemorative Medal.
Sponsors
Asm. William Magnarelli [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] | Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] |
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-10 | Assembly | signed chap.582 |
2022-11-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1524 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2089B |
2022-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.98 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.98 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | print number 357a |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S02089 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A357A