NY S02063 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.86
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.86
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system along state route 93 in the county of Niagara as the "Youngstown Veterans of Foreign Wars Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system along state route 93 in the county of Niagara as the "Youngstown Veterans of Foreign Wars Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.86 |
2014-07-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.394 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a8405a |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2014-03-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-03-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.271 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2063B |
2014-03-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-01-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2063A |
2014-01-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.504 |
2013-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07386 (Same As) 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
A08405 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s2063b
A08405 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s2063b