NY S02036 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - PRINT NUMBER 2036A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - PRINT NUMBER 2036A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the closure of nursing homes.
Title
Relates to the closure of nursing homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2036A |
2017-06-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2017-04-25 | Senate | DEFEATED IN HEALTH |
2017-03-03 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A04395 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
S07108 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
S07108 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH