NY S02031 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that vacancies in the office of regent shall be filled by appointment.
Title
Provides that vacancies in the office of regent shall be filled by appointment.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Jack Martins [R] |
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Assembly | referred to education |
2014-03-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-03-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-03-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.277 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-02-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2031A |
2014-02-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |